+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Agriculture
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
- Tabled Subject To Call
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2013: Passed (House)
February 6, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor