+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Zuber, Campbell)
- Passed
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Tabled Subject To Call
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Banking and Financial Services
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
+ − Statutes Amended (35)
- 081-0018-0001 -
- 081-0018-0003 -
- 081-0018-0005 -
- 081-0018-0007 -
- 081-0018-0008 -
- 081-0018-0009 -
- 081-0018-0011 -
- 081-0018-0013 -
- 081-0018-0014 -
- 081-0018-0015 -
- 081-0018-0017 -
- 081-0018-0019 -
- 081-0018-0021 -
- 081-0018-0023 -
- 081-0018-0025 -
- 081-0018-0027 -
- 081-0018-0028 -
- 081-0018-0029 -
- 081-0018-0031 -
- 081-0018-0033 -
- 081-0018-0035 -
- 081-0018-0036 -
- 081-0018-0037 -
- 081-0018-0039 -
- 081-0018-0040 -
- 081-0018-0041 -
- 081-0018-0043 -
- 081-0018-0045 -
- 081-0018-0047 -
- 081-0018-0049 -
- 081-0018-0051 -
- 081-0018-0053 -
- 081-0018-0055 -
- 081-0018-0061 -
- 081-0018-0063 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2016: Passed (House)
March 2, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor