+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Turner,Rushing
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Collins,Clarke,Fillingane
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reconsidered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Denny, Turner, Crawford)
- Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 13, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
March 12, 2014: Passed (House)
February 12, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor