+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Public Health and Human Services
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Health and Welfare
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2018: Passed (House)
January 31, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor