+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections
+ − Vote
February 29, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor