+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2018: Passed (House)
February 1, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor