+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Busby, Massengill)
- Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Passed (House)
February 4, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor