+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A;Public Health and Human Services
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
- DR - TSDPCS: JA To PH
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Public Health and Welfare
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 11, 2015: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor