+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 7, 2017: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor