+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Zuber
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Fillingane,Montgomery,Hudson
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 1, 2014: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 6, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
February 10, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor