+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor