+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Public Property
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Public Property
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2014: Passed As Amended (House)
February 7, 2014: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor