+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
+ − Vote
February 10, 2015: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor