+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On March 26, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Cockerham,White,Tullos
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Wiggins,Boyd,Parker
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary A
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2022: Passed As Amended (House)
February 9, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor