+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Reconsidered
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 22, 2013: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
February 28, 2013: Passed As Amended (House)
February 11, 2013: Passed As Amended (Senate)
February 6, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor