+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2013: Passed (House)
February 6, 2013: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor