+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Votes (3)
March 23, 2017: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
March 1, 2017: Passed As Amended (House)
February 7, 2017: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor