+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance