+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Lamar,Zuber,Powell
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Harkins,Boyd,Sparks
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: FI To AC
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 29, 2021: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 9, 2021: Passed As Amended (House)
February 8, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor