+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 25, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor