+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: TR To WM
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Transportation;Ways and Means
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: HI To FI
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Highways and Transportation;Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 11, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor