+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Died On Calendar
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AE To CA
- DR - TSDP: CA To AE
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To County Affairs;Apportionment and Elections
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor