+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Moore,Crawford,Criswell
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tollison,Wiggins,Blount
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hopkins, Moore, Roberson, Wooten)
- Passed As Amended
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Education
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 25, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
February 29, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor