+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 8, 2017: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor