+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2017: Passed As Amended (House)
February 8, 2017: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor