+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
+ − Vote
February 6, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor