+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Denny,Barker,Wilson
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Doty,Blount,Polk
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Miles, Denny, Reynolds)
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
March 2, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor