+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
June 10, 2020: Passed (House)
March 4, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor