+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Read
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,DeBar
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (125)
- 063-0019-0027 -
- 063-0019-0051 -
- 063-0019-0055 -
- 075-0015-0009 -
- 075-0015-0031 -
- 075-0067-0115 -
- 075-0067-0215 -
- 075-0067-0239 -
- 075-0067-0321 -
- 075-0067-0419 -
- 075-0067-0505 -
- 075-0067-0525 -
- 075-0067-0527 -
- 081-0018-0015 -
- 081-0019-0017 -
- 081-0019-0019 -
- 081-0021-0003 -
- 081-0021-0009 -
- 081-0021-0025 -
- 081-0022-0005 -
- 081-0022-0023 -
- 081-0001-0075 -
- 081-0001-0087 -
- 081-0001-0093 -
- 081-0001-0099 -
- 081-0001-0100 -
- 081-0001-0107 -
- 081-0001-0111 -
- 081-0001-0115 -
- 081-0003-0012 -
- 081-0007-0001 -
- 081-0009-0007 -
- 081-0012-0229 -
- 081-0014-0179 -
- 081-0027-0004.103 -
- 055-0024-0011 -
- 055-0024-0009 -
- 055-0024-0017 -
- 069-0005-0001 -
- 069-0005-0003 -
- 069-0005-0011 -
- 069-0005-0015 -
- 069-0005-0019 -
- 075-0076-0325 -
- 075-0076-0033 -
- 075-0076-0081 -
- 075-0076-0085 -
- 059-0005-0033 -
- 045-0011-0003 -
- 045-0011-0005 -
- 045-0011-0007 -
- 025-0053-0005 -
- 007-0007-0003 -
- 025-0053-0029 -
- 025-0053-0151 -
- 025-0053-0171 -
- 031-0007-0010 -
- 063-0009-0031 -
- 083-0001-0027 -
- 083-0002-0033 -
- 083-0002-0035 -
- 083-0005-0017 -
- 083-0005-0041 -
- 083-0005-0045 -
- 083-0005-0069 -
- 083-0005-0072 -
- 083-0005-0073 -
- 083-0005-0077 -
- 083-0009-0003 -
- 083-0017-0071 -
- 083-0017-0519 -
- 083-0019-0021 -
- 083-0021-0001 -
- 083-0037-0029 -
- 083-0039-0003 -
- 083-0073-0009 -
- 045-0006-0015 -
- 029-0015-0009 -
- 029-0015-0010 -
- 029-0001-0107 -
- 053-0001-0077 -
- 053-0011-0023 -
- 053-0001-0007 -
- 053-0001-0073 -
- 053-0003-0013 -
- 051-0015-0147 -
- 051-0009-0149 -
- 025-0009-0141 -
- 007-0009-0022 -
- 007-0003-0059 -
- 023-0015-0005 -
- 023-0015-0169.7 -
- 029-0001-0095 -
- 077-0003-0087 -
- 077-0001-0006 -
- 077-0001-0015 -
- 077-0001-0029 -
- 077-0001-0053 -
- 077-0003-0008 -
- 077-0003-0089 -
- 077-0003-0503 -
- 077-0003-0507 -
- 077-0003-0509 -
- 077-0007-0127 -
- 077-0007-0333 -
- 077-0007-0339 -
- 077-0007-0337 -
- 077-0009-0489 -
- 077-0011-0201 -
- 099-0018-0001 -
- 025-0011-0015 -
- 025-0011-0143 -
- 025-0011-0307 -
- 025-0011-0411 -
- 025-0011-0415 -
- 027-0019-0179 -
- 089-0012-0037 -
- 051-0013-0141 -
- 011-0046-0017 -
- 071-0003-0100 -
- 059-0017-0027 -
- 007-0005-0061 -
- 025-0009-0119 -
- 027-0104-0103 -
- 099-0019-0073 -
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 15, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 29, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
March 2, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor