+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Bounds
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Tindell
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Appropriations
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (148)
- 069-0001-0001 -
- 069-0001-0009 -
- 069-0001-0011 -
- 069-0001-0013 -
- 069-0001-0014 -
- 069-0015-0002 -
- 069-0015-0005 -
- 069-0015-0007 -
- 069-0015-0009 -
- 069-0015-0015 -
- 069-0015-0051 -
- 069-0015-0053 -
- 069-0015-0055 -
- 069-0015-0057 -
- 069-0015-0061 -
- 069-0015-0063 -
- 069-0015-0065 -
- 069-0015-0201 -
- 069-0015-0301 -
- 069-0019-0001 -
- 069-0021-0105 -
- 069-0023-0003 -
- 069-0023-0107 -
- 069-0024-0003 -
- 069-0025-0001 -
- 069-0025-0003 -
- 069-0025-0005 -
- 069-0025-0007 -
- 069-0025-0103 -
- 069-0005-0001 -
- 069-0005-0003 -
- 069-0005-0005 -
- 069-0005-0007 -
- 069-0005-0008 -
- 069-0005-0011 -
- 069-0005-0013 -
- 049-0002-0001 -
- 049-0002-0002 -
- 049-0002-0004 -
- 049-0002-0005 -
- 049-0002-0006 -
- 049-0002-0007 -
- 049-0002-0009 -
- 049-0002-0013 -
- 049-0002-0017 -
- 049-0002-0019 -
- 049-0002-0021 -
- 049-0002-0023 -
- 049-0002-0029 -
- 049-0019-0001 -
- 049-0019-0003 -
- 049-0019-0005 -
- 049-0019-0007 -
- 049-0019-0009 -
- 049-0019-0011 -
- 049-0019-0015 -
- 049-0019-0021 -
- 049-0019-0025 -
- 049-0019-0065 -
- 049-0019-0067 -
- 049-0019-0071 -
- 049-0019-0073 -
- 049-0019-0111 -
- 049-0019-0113 -
- 049-0019-0115 -
- 049-0019-0117 -
- 049-0019-0205 -
- 049-0019-0207 -
- 049-0019-0211 -
- 049-0019-0213 -
- 049-0019-0215 -
- 049-0019-0217 -
- 049-0019-0219 -
- 049-0019-0221 -
- 049-0019-0223 -
- 049-0019-0225 -
- 049-0019-0227 -
- 049-0019-0305 -
- 049-0019-0307 -
- 049-0019-0351 -
- 051-0009-0107 -
- 051-0011-0005 -
- 051-0011-0009 -
- 051-0013-0105 -
- 051-0013-0107 -
- 053-0007-0011 -
- 053-0007-0029 -
- 053-0009-0011 -
- 055-0003-0001 -
- 055-0003-0011 -
- 055-0003-0019 -
- 055-0003-0021 -
- 055-0003-0023 -
- 029-0003-0027 -
- 029-0003-0045 -
- 029-0003-0047 -
- 029-0003-0049 -
- 029-0003-0054 -
- 029-0003-0085 -
- 029-0003-0087 -
- 049-0007-0203 -
- 069-0003-0001 -
- 069-0029-0001 -
- 069-0037-0005 -
- 069-0045-0005 -
- 069-0046-0003 -
- 069-0047-0001 -
- 079-0022-0005 -
- 069-0027-0002 -
- 069-0027-0007 -
- 069-0027-0009 -
- 069-0027-0011 -
- 069-0027-0013 -
- 069-0027-0014 -
- 069-0027-0031 -
- 069-0027-0061 -
- 069-0027-0301 -
- 069-0027-0303 -
- 069-0027-0305 -
- 069-0027-0307 -
- 069-0027-0308 -
- 069-0027-0309 -
- 069-0027-0311 -
- 069-0027-0331 -
- 069-0027-0333 -
- 069-0027-0337 -
- 069-0027-0341 -
- 069-0027-0345 -
- 069-0027-0369 -
- 069-0028-0003 -
- 069-0029-0103 -
- 069-0029-0111 -
- 069-0029-0115 -
- 069-0031-0001 -
- 069-0031-0003 -
- 069-0039-0001 -
- 069-0039-0003 -
- 069-0044-0001 -
- 069-0048-0001 -
- 069-0051-0005 -
- 069-0053-0007 -
- 073-0036-0019 -
- 073-0063-0017 -
- 073-0063-0019 -
- 073-0039-0057 -
- 025-0009-0127 -
- 069-0001-0003 -
- 053-0005-0001 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
March 2, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor