+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees Named Beckett,Eubanks,Newman
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tate,Chassaniol,Fillingane
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Apportionment and Elections
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Failed
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 29, 2022: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 9, 2022: Passed As Amended (House)
February 9, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor