+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Conference
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Bell (21st),White,Haney
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Horhn,Harkins,McMahan
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: WD To WM
- DR - TSDPAA: WM To WD
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Workforce Development;Ways and Means
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: LA To FI
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor;Finance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
March 5, 2020: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor