+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 3, 2021: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor