+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died On Calendar
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Taylor, Huddleston (30th))
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Corrections
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corrections
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2015: Passed As Amended (House)
February 4, 2015: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor