+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Bounds, Barnett)
- Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2016: Passed (House)
February 24, 2016: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor