+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees Named Huddleston,Scoggin,Bounds
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Parks,Boyd,Sparks
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Universities and Colleges