+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 7, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor