+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Public Utilities
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- 077-0001-0001 -
- 077-0001-0003 -
- 077-0001-0005 -
- 077-0001-0006 -
- 077-0001-0011 -
- 077-0001-0015 -
- 077-0001-0017 -
- 077-0001-0019 -
- 077-0001-0021 -
- 077-0001-0025 -
- 077-0001-0027 -
- 077-0001-0029 -
- 077-0001-0031 -
- 077-0001-0033 -
- 077-0001-0035 -
- 077-0001-0037 -
- 077-0001-0039 -
- 077-0001-0041 -
- 077-0001-0043 -
- 077-0001-0047 -
- 077-0001-0049 -
- 077-0001-0051 -
- 077-0001-0055 -
- 077-0003-0005 -
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2018: Concurred in Amend From House (Senate)
February 28, 2018: Passed As Amended (House)
February 1, 2018: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor