+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: AP To AC
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: AC To AP
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency;Appropriations
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2014: Passed (House)
February 10, 2014: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor