+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
- DR - TSDP: JA To MA
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- DR - TSDP: MA To JA
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Military Affairs;Judiciary A
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs