+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B