+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Local and Private Legislation
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local and Private
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2019: Passed (House)
February 25, 2019: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor