+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Amend From House
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To ME
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: ME To AP
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDP: ME To AP
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations