+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: ME To AP
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 6, 2019: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor