+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Agriculture
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B