+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 28, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Harkins,Doty,Parks
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reconsidered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hood, Lamar, Steverson)
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Ways and Means
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (House)
June 27, 2020: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
June 16, 2020: Passed As Amended (House)
March 10, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor