+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Brown,Hood,Bennett
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Wiggins,Burton,Caughman
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Amended
- Passed As Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Clarke, Brown, Bomgar, Wooten)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
- DR - TSDPAA: AP To ME
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- DR - TSDPAA: ME To AP
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- DR - TSDPCS: ME To AP
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
April 16, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
March 29, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
March 2, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor