+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division B
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
February 9, 2022: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor