+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Filed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Named Gipson,Hood,Monsour
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Named Tindell,Hopson,Doty
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Concurrence
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Amended
- Motion to Reconsider Entered (Dixon, Gipson, Hood, Wooten)
- Passed As Amended
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read the Third Time
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Judiciary B
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Passed As Amended
- Amended
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary, Division A
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (House)
April 19, 2016: Conference Report Adopted (Senate)
March 25, 2016: Passed As Amended (House)
March 1, 2016: Passed As Amended (Senate)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor