+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Pass
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Insurance
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2020: Passed (House)
March 5, 2020: Passed (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor